House
|
04/03/2025
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
House concurred with Senate amendments; Roll Call 275: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 87, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Representative Garcia Wilburn added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2025
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
Representative VanNatter added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Authored by Representative Judy
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Coauthored by Representative Jeter
|
|
|