Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 20, 2025
Fiscal Note March 11, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025
Fiscal Note March 6, 2025
Fiscal Note February 3, 2025
Fiscal Note January 29, 2025
Fiscal Note January 27, 2025
Fiscal Note January 27, 2025
Fiscal Note January 27, 2025
Bill January 15, 2025
Fiscal Note January 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 6, 2025
Bill January 27, 2025