*EH1626.1* March 7, 2025 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1626 _____ DIGEST OF HB 1626 (Updated March 5, 2025 2:06 pm - DI 140) Citations Affected: IC 31-14; IC 31-17. Synopsis: Written findings in child custody orders. Requires a court to include in: (1) a custody order; or (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing a custody order; the court's findings of fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order or appellate decision is based. Effective: July 1, 2025. Judy, Jeter, VanNatter, Garcia Wilburn (SENATE SPONSOR — BROWN L) January 21, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary. January 27, 2025, reported — Do Pass. January 29, 2025, read second time, ordered engrossed. January 30, 2025, engrossed. February 3, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 87, nays 2. SENATE ACTION February 19, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary. March 6, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass. EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 March 7, 2025 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1626 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning family law and juvenile law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 31-14-13-7.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA 2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS 3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 7.5. (a) As used in this section, 4 "custody order" means: 5 (1) an order: 6 (A) awarding custody; 7 (B) modifying custody; or 8 (C) denying modification of custody; 9 under this chapter; or 10 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order 11 described in subdivision (1). 12 (b) A court shall include in a custody order the court's findings 13 of fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order is based. 14 SECTION 2. IC 31-17-2-8.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 15 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 16 1, 2025]: Sec. 8.2. (a) As used in this section, "custody order" 17 means: EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 2 1 (1) an order: 2 (A) awarding custody; 3 (B) modifying custody; or 4 (C) denying modification of custody; 5 under this chapter; or 6 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order 7 described in subdivision (1). 8 (b) A court shall include in a custody order the court's findings 9 of fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order is based. EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Judiciary, to which was referred House Bill 1626, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1626 as introduced.) JETER Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Judiciary, to which was referred House Bill No. 1626, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. (Reference is to HB 1626 as printed January 27, 2025.) BROWN L, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0 EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119