Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 538: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 502: yeas 44, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate advisors appointed: Yoder and Deery
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Senate conferees appointed: Goode and Jackson
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House advisors appointed: Barrett, Isa, Goss-Reaves and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House conferees appointed: Clere and Porter
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Third reading: passed;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Cosponsor: Senator Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Goode, Ford J.D., Deery
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Authored by Representative Clere
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Coauthored by Representatives Porter, Behning, Pryor
|
|
|