Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 8, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note April 4, 2025
Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Fiscal Note February 6, 2025
Fiscal Note February 4, 2025
Bill January 15, 2025
Fiscal Note January 15, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2025
Bill February 4, 2025