House | 03/03/2025 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Cosponsor: Representative Andrade | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | House sponsor: Representative Olthoff | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/23/2025 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/21/2025 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 01/08/2025 | Authored by Senators Dernulc and Niemeyer |