Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Public Law 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Representative O'Brien added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Senator Dernulc added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
Senator Niemeyer added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
House sponsor: Representative McNamara
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2025
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2025
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2025
|
Authored by Senators Becker and Tomes
|
|
|