Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0419 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 17, 2025
Fiscal Note February 14, 2025
Fiscal Note January 14, 2025
Bill January 13, 2025
Fiscal Note January 13, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2025