LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Indiana IN
Legislatures
2025 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0525
Draft Versions
IN
Indiana Senate Bill SB0525
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Indiana 2025 Regular Session
Indiana Senate Bill SB0525
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note
April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note
April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note
April 8, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 11, 2025
Bill
January 15, 2025
Compare
Fiscal Note
January 15, 2025
Engrossed
Bill
April 14, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 18, 2025
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 23, 2025
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 8, 2025
Compare
Bill
February 11, 2025
Compare