LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2081
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2081
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2081
Action History
House
02/23/2023
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/22/2023
House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
House
02/16/2023
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
House
02/15/2023
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
House
01/19/2023
House Referred to Committee on Education
House
01/19/2023
House Introduced