Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session

Kansas House Bill HB2081 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 Session of 2023
22 HOUSE BILL No. 2081
33 By Committee on Education
44 1-19
55 AN ACT establishing the aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship
66 program; making and concerning appropriations for the fiscal years
77 ending June 30, 2024, June 30, 2025, June 30, 2026, June 30, 2027, and
88 June 30, 2028, for the department of education for such scholarships.
99 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Kansas:
1010 Section 1. 
1111 DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
1212 (a) There is appropriated for the above agency from the state general
1313 fund for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024, the following:
1414 Aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program ...............$160,000
1515 Sec. 2. 
1616 DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
1717 (a) There is appropriated for the above agency from the state general
1818 fund for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025, the following:
1919 Aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program ...............$160,000
2020 Provided, That any unencumbered balance in the aspiring future teacher of
2121 the year scholarship program account in excess of $100 as of June 30,
2222 2024, is hereby reappropriated for fiscal year 2025.
2323 Sec. 3. 
2424 DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
2525 (a) There is appropriated for the above agency from the state general
2626 fund for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026, the following:
2727 Aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program ...............$160,000
2828 Provided, That any unencumbered balance in the aspiring future teacher of
2929 the year scholarship program account in excess of $100 as of June 30,
3030 2025, is hereby reappropriated for fiscal year 2026.
3131 Sec. 4. 
3232 DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
3333 (a) There is appropriated for the above agency from the state general
3434 fund for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2027, the following:
3535 Aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program ...............$160,000
3636 Provided, That any unencumbered balance in the aspiring future teacher of
3737 the year scholarship program account in excess of $100 as of June 30,
3838 2026, is hereby reappropriated for fiscal year 2027.
3939 Sec. 5. 
4040 1
4141 2
4242 3
4343 4
4444 5
4545 6
4646 7
4747 8
4848 9
4949 10
5050 11
5151 12
5252 13
5353 14
5454 15
5555 16
5656 17
5757 18
5858 19
5959 20
6060 21
6161 22
6262 23
6363 24
6464 25
6565 26
6666 27
6767 28
6868 29
6969 30
7070 31
7171 32
7272 33
7373 34
7474 35
7575 36 HB 2081 2
7676 DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
7777 (a) There is appropriated for the above agency from the state general
7878 fund for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2028, the following:
7979 Aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship program ...............$160,000
8080 Provided, That any unencumbered balance in the aspiring future teacher of
8181 the year scholarship program account in excess of $100 as of June 30,
8282 2027, is hereby reappropriated for fiscal year 2028.
8383 Sec. 6. Sections 6 through 10, and amendments thereto, shall be
8484 known and may be cited as the aspiring future teacher of the year
8585 scholarship program act.
8686 Sec. 7. As used in the aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship
8787 program act:
8888 (a) "Postsecondary educational institution" means the same as defined
8989 in K.S.A. 74-3201b, and amendments thereto.
9090 (b) "Private independent postsecondary educational institution"
9191 means any not-for-profit institution of postsecondary education with its
9292 main campus or principal place of operation in Kansas that is operated
9393 independently and not controlled or administered by any state agency or
9494 subdivision of the state, maintains open enrollment and is accredited by a
9595 nationally recognized accrediting agency for higher education in the
9696 United States.
9797 (c) "Qualified student" means a person who: (1) Is a resident of the
9898 state of Kansas; and (2) has been accepted for admission to or is enrolled
9999 in a course of instruction leading to licensure as a teacher in a
100100 postsecondary educational institution or private independent
101101 postsecondary educational institution.
102102 Sec. 8. (a) There is hereby established the aspiring future teacher of
103103 the year scholarship program.
104104 (b) (1) A scholarship may be awarded under the program to any
105105 qualified student and may be renewed for each such student who remains
106106 qualified for the scholarship. Determination of the students qualified for
107107 such scholarships shall be made by the commissioner of education. In
108108 making such determination, the commissioner shall consult with the
109109 immediately preceding school year's recipients of the Kansas teacher of
110110 the year award. To the extent practicable, the scholarships shall be
111111 awarded to qualified applicants who have similar backgrounds and
112112 attributes of such recipients.
113113 (2) Within the limitations of appropriations therefor, eight
114114 scholarships shall be awarded annually, and the amount awarded to each
115115 applicant shall be $2,500 each semester.
116116 (3) If a student is not enrolled on a full-time basis, a student shall
117117 complete the course of study within the time period specified in the
118118 agreement and shall receive a proportionate amount of the scholarship
119119 1
120120 2
121121 3
122122 4
123123 5
124124 6
125125 7
126126 8
127127 9
128128 10
129129 11
130130 12
131131 13
132132 14
133133 15
134134 16
135135 17
136136 18
137137 19
138138 20
139139 21
140140 22
141141 23
142142 24
143143 25
144144 26
145145 27
146146 28
147147 29
148148 30
149149 31
150150 32
151151 33
152152 34
153153 35
154154 36
155155 37
156156 38
157157 39
158158 40
159159 41
160160 42
161161 43 HB 2081 3
162162 allowed under subsection (b)(2) based upon the number of hours enrolled
163163 in an academic period and computed as a fraction of the total number of
164164 credit hours required for full-time enrollment.
165165 Sec. 9. (a) An applicant for designation as a qualified student and for
166166 the award of a scholarship under the aspiring future teacher of the year
167167 scholarship program shall provide to the commissioner of education, on
168168 forms supplied by the commissioner, information required by the
169169 commissioner.
170170 (b) As a condition to awarding a scholarship under this act, the
171171 commissioner and the applicant shall enter into an agreement, which shall
172172 require the applicant to:
173173 (1) Complete the required course of instruction as specified in the
174174 agreement;
175175 (2) obtain and maintain necessary licensure as specified in the
176176 agreement;
177177 (3) engage in teaching in Kansas and comply with such other terms
178178 and conditions as may be specified by such agreement;
179179 (4) commence teaching on a full-time basis in Kansas within six
180180 months after licensure in an accredited public elementary or secondary
181181 school in accordance with the agreement and continue teaching on a full-
182182 time basis for a period of not less than two years; and
183183 (5) maintain records and make reports to the commissioner as
184184 required by the commissioner to document the satisfaction of the
185185 obligations under this act and the agreement.
186186 Sec. 10. The state board of education shall adopt rules and regulations
187187 for the administration of the aspiring future teacher of the year scholarship
188188 program and establish terms, conditions and obligations, which shall be
189189 incorporated into the provisions of any agreement entered into between the
190190 commissioner of education and an applicant for the award of a scholarship
191191 under the program. The terms, conditions and obligations shall be
192192 consistent with the provisions of law relating to the program.
193193 Sec. 11. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its
194194 publication in the statute book.
195195 1
196196 2
197197 3
198198 4
199199 5
200200 6
201201 7
202202 8
203203 9
204204 10
205205 11
206206 12
207207 13
208208 14
209209 15
210210 16
211211 17
212212 18
213213 19
214214 20
215215 21
216216 22
217217 23
218218 24
219219 25
220220 26
221221 27
222222 28
223223 29
224224 30
225225 31
226226 32
227227 33