LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2088
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2088
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2088
Action History
House
02/23/2023
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/01/2023
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military
House
01/26/2023
House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
House
01/19/2023
House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
House
01/19/2023
House Introduced