Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Engrossed on Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House Introduced |