House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 36 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoheisel was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoheisel
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 6, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|