House
|
04/28/2023
|
House The Legislature having adjourned sine die on April 28, 2023, there was no opportunity to reconsider and the veto is sustained.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, May 12, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 56
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 22 Nay: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries and Representative Hoye appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson, and Senator Pettey are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Humphries, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|