Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House Introduced |