Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Engrossed on Friday, March 17, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|