Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | House Introduced |