Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 83 Nay: 39 | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | House Introduced |