Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller, S. was rejected Yea: 41 Nay: 80 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller, S. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, January 29, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Introduced |