House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Reengrossed on Wednesday, April 3, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 114 Nay: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|