LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB152
Action History
KS
Kansas Senate Bill SB152
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas Senate Bill SB152
Action History
Senate
01/10/2024
Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Senate
04/05/2023
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
Senate
04/04/2023
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, April 4, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 548-S
Senate
02/03/2023
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Senate
02/02/2023
Senate Introduced