Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 86 Nay: 37
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Senate Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys, and Senator Pettey are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Helgerson are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 104 Nay: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|