Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 82 Nay: 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 84 Nay: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to refer to committee failed Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Concannon
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care; Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S - CANCELED
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|