Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 17 Nay: 23 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Introduced |