Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 33 Nay: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Bergquist, Representative Blex and Representative Featherston appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator McGinn , Senator Bowers and Senator Francisco as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Owens
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|