Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Conference
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 80 Nay: 41
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Received and Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate Introduced
|
|
|