Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB552 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 Session of 2024
22 SENATE BILL No. 552
33 By Committee on Ways and Means
44 3-14
55 AN ACT concerning the state board of regents; enacting the Kansas
66 campus restoration act; relating to deferred maintenance and demolition
77 of facilities at postsecondary educational institutions; authorizing the
88 board to adopt rules and regulations; establishing the Kansas campus
99 restoration fund in the state treasury; authorizing certain transfers from
1010 the state general fund to the Kansas campus restoration fund; requiring
1111 annual reports be submitted to certain committees of the legislature.
1212 Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Kansas:
1313 Section 1. (a) The provisions of sections 1 through 8, and
1414 amendments thereto, shall be known and may be cited as the Kansas
1515 campus restoration act.
1616 (b) The purpose of the Kansas campus restoration act is to reduce
1717 deferred maintenance of educational mission-critical facilities at
1818 postsecondary educational institutions, to bring such facilities to a state of
1919 good repair and to provide for the demolition or razing of facilities at state
2020 educational institutions that are no longer mission-critical.
2121 (c) As used in the Kansas campus restoration act:
2222 (1) "Board of regents" means the same as defined in K.S.A. 76-711,
2323 and amendments thereto.
2424 (2) "Fund" means the Kansas campus restoration fund established in
2525 section 2, and amendments thereto.
2626 (3) "Postsecondary educational institution" means the same as
2727 defined in K.S.A. 74-3201b, and amendments thereto.
2828 (4) "State educational institution" means the same as defined in
2929 K.S.A. 76-711, and amendments thereto.
3030 Sec. 2. (a) There is hereby established in the state treasury the Kansas
3131 campus restoration fund. The Kansas campus restoration fund shall be
3232 administered by the board of regents. All expenditures from the fund shall
3333 be made in accordance with appropriation acts upon warrants of the
3434 director of accounts and reports issued pursuant to vouchers approved by
3535 the board of regents or by a person or persons designated by the board of
3636 regents.
3737 (b) A deferred maintenance account of the fund shall be established
3838 for each postsecondary educational institution for the purpose of making
3939 capital improvement expenditures from the fund.
4040 1
4141 2
4242 3
4343 4
4444 5
4545 6
4646 7
4747 8
4848 9
4949 10
5050 11
5151 12
5252 13
5353 14
5454 15
5555 16
5656 17
5757 18
5858 19
5959 20
6060 21
6161 22
6262 23
6363 24
6464 25
6565 26
6666 27
6767 28
6868 29
6969 30
7070 31
7171 32
7272 33
7373 34
7474 35
7575 36 SB 552 2
7676 (c) (1) Except as provided in paragraphs (2) and (3), all expenditures
7777 from the fund shall require a match of nonstate moneys on a $1-for-$1
7878 basis from either the postsecondary educational institution or private
7979 moneys.
8080 (2) Expenditures from the fund for a community college, technical
8181 college or municipal university shall not require a match.
8282 (3) Expenditures from the fund from a state educational institution's
8383 deferred maintenance account for demolition or razing of buildings or
8484 facilities on the campus of such state educational institution shall not
8585 require a match.
8686 (d) On or before the 10
8787 th
8888 day of each month, the director of accounts
8989 and reports shall transfer from the state general fund to the Kansas campus
9090 restoration fund interest earnings based on:
9191 (1) The average daily balance of moneys in the Kansas campus
9292 restoration fund for the preceding month; and
9393 (2) the net earnings rate for the pooled money investment portfolio
9494 for the preceding month.
9595 Sec. 3. On July 1, 2025, July 1, 2026, July 1, 2027, July 1, 2028, July
9696 1, 2029, July 1, 2030, July 1, 2031, July 1, 2032, July 1, 2033, July 1,
9797 2034, and July 1, 2035, or as soon thereafter each such date as moneys are
9898 available, the director of accounts and reports shall transfer $32,700,000
9999 from the state general fund to the Kansas campus restoration fund.
100100 Sec. 4. (a) Each postsecondary educational institution shall develop
101101 and submit to the board of regents a plan for the purpose of rehabilitating,
102102 remodeling or renovating existing facilities or building new facilities that
103103 are mission-critical of such postsecondary educational institution and to
104104 bring such facilities to a state of good repair. Such plan shall also include a
105105 list of facilities for demolition or razing. Each postsecondary educational
106106 institution's plan shall be subject to approval by the board of regents.
107107 (b) The board of regents shall develop a comprehensive Kansas
108108 campus restoration plan that includes facilities from each postsecondary
109109 educational institution's plan as approved by the board of regents.
110110 (c) The board of regents shall ensure that facilities located on the
111111 Kansas state university polytechnic campus in Salina, Kansas, and the
112112 university of Kansas Edwards campus in Overland Park, Kansas, are not
113113 excluded from direct participation in the Kansas campus restoration plan.
114114 (d) The Kansas campus restoration plan shall encourage, and the
115115 board of regents may require, a reduction of total campus square footage in
116116 a project associated with such plan.
117117 Sec. 5. (a) Commencing in fiscal year 2026 through fiscal year 2036,
118118 the board of regents shall distribute in each fiscal year an aggregate
119119 amount of $30,000,000 from the Kansas campus restoration fund to each
120120 state educational institution's deferred maintenance account established
121121 1
122122 2
123123 3
124124 4
125125 5
126126 6
127127 7
128128 8
129129 9
130130 10
131131 11
132132 12
133133 13
134134 14
135135 15
136136 16
137137 17
138138 18
139139 19
140140 20
141141 21
142142 22
143143 23
144144 24
145145 25
146146 26
147147 27
148148 28
149149 29
150150 30
151151 31
152152 32
153153 33
154154 34
155155 35
156156 36
157157 37
158158 38
159159 39
160160 40
161161 41
162162 42
163163 43 SB 552 3
164164 pursuant to section 2, and amendments thereto, in accordance with the
165165 Kansas campus restoration plan developed and approved pursuant to
166166 section 4, and amendments thereto.
167167 (b) Commencing in fiscal year 2026 through fiscal year 2036, the
168168 board of regents shall credit $100,000 in each fiscal year from the Kansas
169169 campus restoration fund to each community college, technical college and
170170 municipal university account established pursuant to section 2, and
171171 amendments thereto.
172172 Sec. 6. The board of regents is hereby authorized to adopt rules and
173173 regulations necessary to implement and administer the provisions of the
174174 Kansas campus restoration act and shall adopt rules and regulations to
175175 define:
176176 (a) "Educational mission-critical facilities." Such definition may
177177 include, but not be limited to, any facility of a research or economic
178178 generation capacity that the board of regents deems essential. Such
179179 definition shall not include auxiliary or athletic-funded facilities; and
180180 (b) "state of good repair." Such definition shall be of an industry
181181 standard and shall be presented to the joint committee on state building
182182 construction for review and comment.
183183 Sec. 7. The board of regents shall submit a report annually on or
184184 before the first day of the regular session of the legislature on the progress
185185 of the Kansas campus restoration plan to the senate committee on ways
186186 and means, the house of representatives committee on appropriations, the
187187 house of representatives higher education budget committee and the joint
188188 committee on state building construction.
189189 Sec. 8. The provisions of sections 1 through 8, and amendments
190190 thereto, shall expire on July 1, 2036.
191191 Sec. 9. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its
192192 publication in the statute book.
193193 1
194194 2
195195 3
196196 4
197197 5
198198 6
199199 7
200200 8
201201 9
202202 10
203203 11
204204 12
205205 13
206206 14
207207 15
208208 16
209209 17
210210 18
211211 19
212212 20
213213 21
214214 22
215215 23
216216 24
217217 25
218218 26
219219 27
220220 28
221221 29