Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB552 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/14/2024

                            Session of 2024
SENATE BILL No. 552
By Committee on Ways and Means
3-14
AN ACT concerning the state board of regents; enacting the Kansas 
campus restoration act; relating to deferred maintenance and demolition 
of facilities at postsecondary educational institutions; authorizing the 
board to adopt rules and regulations; establishing the Kansas campus 
restoration fund in the state treasury; authorizing certain transfers from 
the state general fund to the Kansas campus restoration fund; requiring 
annual reports be submitted to certain committees of the legislature.
Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Kansas:
Section 1. (a) The provisions of sections 1 through 8, and 
amendments thereto, shall be known and may be cited as the Kansas 
campus restoration act.
(b) The purpose of the Kansas campus restoration act is to reduce 
deferred maintenance of educational mission-critical facilities at 
postsecondary educational institutions, to bring such facilities to a state of 
good repair and to provide for the demolition or razing of facilities at state 
educational institutions that are no longer mission-critical.
(c) As used in the Kansas campus restoration act:
(1) "Board of regents" means the same as defined in K.S.A. 76-711, 
and amendments thereto.
(2) "Fund" means the Kansas campus restoration fund established in 
section 2, and amendments thereto.
(3) "Postsecondary educational institution" means the same as 
defined in K.S.A. 74-3201b, and amendments thereto.
(4) "State educational institution" means the same as defined in 
K.S.A. 76-711, and amendments thereto.
Sec. 2. (a) There is hereby established in the state treasury the Kansas 
campus restoration fund. The Kansas campus restoration fund shall be 
administered by the board of regents. All expenditures from the fund shall 
be made in accordance with appropriation acts upon warrants of the 
director of accounts and reports issued pursuant to vouchers approved by 
the board of regents or by a person or persons designated by the board of 
regents.
(b) A deferred maintenance account of the fund shall be established 
for each postsecondary educational institution for the purpose of making 
capital improvement expenditures from the fund.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36 SB 552	2
(c) (1) Except as provided in paragraphs (2) and (3), all expenditures 
from the fund shall require a match of nonstate moneys on a $1-for-$1 
basis from either the postsecondary educational institution or private 
moneys.
(2) Expenditures from the fund for a community college, technical 
college or municipal university shall not require a match.
(3) Expenditures from the fund from a state educational institution's 
deferred maintenance account for demolition or razing of buildings or 
facilities on the campus of such state educational institution shall not 
require a match.
(d) On or before the 10
th 
day of each month, the director of accounts 
and reports shall transfer from the state general fund to the Kansas campus 
restoration fund interest earnings based on:
(1) The average daily balance of moneys in the Kansas campus 
restoration fund for the preceding month; and
(2) the net earnings rate for the pooled money investment portfolio 
for the preceding month.
Sec. 3. On July 1, 2025, July 1, 2026, July 1, 2027, July 1, 2028, July 
1, 2029, July 1, 2030, July 1, 2031, July 1, 2032, July 1, 2033, July 1, 
2034, and July 1, 2035, or as soon thereafter each such date as moneys are 
available, the director of accounts and reports shall transfer $32,700,000 
from the state general fund to the Kansas campus restoration fund.
Sec. 4. (a) Each postsecondary educational institution shall develop 
and submit to the board of regents a plan for the purpose of rehabilitating, 
remodeling or renovating existing facilities or building new facilities that 
are mission-critical of such postsecondary educational institution and to 
bring such facilities to a state of good repair. Such plan shall also include a 
list of facilities for demolition or razing. Each postsecondary educational 
institution's plan shall be subject to approval by the board of regents.
(b) The board of regents shall develop a comprehensive Kansas 
campus restoration plan that includes facilities from each postsecondary 
educational institution's plan as approved by the board of regents.
(c) The board of regents shall ensure that facilities located on the 
Kansas state university polytechnic campus in Salina, Kansas, and the 
university of Kansas Edwards campus in Overland Park, Kansas, are not 
excluded from direct participation in the Kansas campus restoration plan.
(d) The Kansas campus restoration plan shall encourage, and the 
board of regents may require, a reduction of total campus square footage in 
a project associated with such plan.
Sec. 5. (a) Commencing in fiscal year 2026 through fiscal year 2036, 
the board of regents shall distribute in each fiscal year an aggregate 
amount of $30,000,000 from the Kansas campus restoration fund to each 
state educational institution's deferred maintenance account established 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43 SB 552	3
pursuant to section 2, and amendments thereto, in accordance with the 
Kansas campus restoration plan developed and approved pursuant to 
section 4, and amendments thereto.
(b) Commencing in fiscal year 2026 through fiscal year 2036, the 
board of regents shall credit $100,000 in each fiscal year from the Kansas 
campus restoration fund to each community college, technical college and 
municipal university account established pursuant to section 2, and 
amendments thereto.
Sec. 6. The board of regents is hereby authorized to adopt rules and 
regulations necessary to implement and administer the provisions of the 
Kansas campus restoration act and shall adopt rules and regulations to 
define:
(a) "Educational mission-critical facilities." Such definition may 
include, but not be limited to, any facility of a research or economic 
generation capacity that the board of regents deems essential. Such 
definition shall not include auxiliary or athletic-funded facilities; and
(b) "state of good repair." Such definition shall be of an industry 
standard and shall be presented to the joint committee on state building 
construction for review and comment.
Sec. 7. The board of regents shall submit a report annually on or 
before the first day of the regular session of the legislature on the progress 
of the Kansas campus restoration plan to the senate committee on ways 
and means, the house of representatives committee on appropriations, the 
house of representatives higher education budget committee and the joint 
committee on state building construction.
Sec. 8. The provisions of sections 1 through 8, and amendments 
thereto, shall expire on July 1, 2036.
Sec. 9. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its 
publication in the statute book.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29