House
|
04/10/2025
|
House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 28, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
House Reengrossed on Thursday, March 27, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 88 Nay: 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 28 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Government Efficiency
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 10, 2025, 9:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
House Engrossed on Monday, February 24, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Government Efficiency
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 97 Nay: 26
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2025, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
House Introduced
|
|
|