Kansas 2025-2026 Regular Session

Kansas House Bill HB2304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Bill February 5, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 27, 2025

Comm Sub

Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025

Amended

Bill
Bill