LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2348
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2348
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2025-2026 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2348
Action History
House
02/19/2025
House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
House
02/17/2025
House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
House
02/11/2025
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2025, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
House
02/07/2025
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
House
02/07/2025
House Introduced