Senate | 03/29/2022 | floor amendment (3) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | to Health & Welfare (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 82-0 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
House | 02/11/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | to Health & Family Services (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House |