House | 03/29/2022 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | returned to Rules | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | introduced in House |