Senate | 01/24/2022 | to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 78-17 | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
House | 01/18/2022 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 01/12/2022 | to Health & Family Services (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | introduced in House | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |