Senate | 04/13/2022 | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | returned to Rules | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | introduced in House |