House
|
04/13/2022
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 198)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 72-23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
passed 29-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
passed 26-9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
3rd reading, passed 70-23 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
passed 27-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
floor amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|