LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kentucky KY
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR245
Action History
KY
Kentucky Senate Bill SR245
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kentucky 2022 Regular Session
Kentucky Senate Bill SR245
Action History
Senate
04/14/2022
adopted 36-0
Senate
04/13/2022
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 14, 2022
Senate
03/21/2022
to State & Local Government (S)
Senate
03/18/2022
to Committee on Committees (S)
Senate
03/18/2022
introduced in Senate