House
|
03/30/2023
|
posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2), and Floor Amendment (3-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2) and Floor Amendment (3-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1), (2) and (3-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 52-35 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (1) and (2) and Floor Amendment (3-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
to Transportation (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
passed 27 -6 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
floor amendment withdrawn Floor Amendments (1) and (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
to Transportation (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|