Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 120)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
passed 80-18
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendment (1) defeated
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendment (3) ruled not germane
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
floor amendments (4), (5-title), (6) and (7-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
floor amendment (3) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
floor amendments (1) and (2) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 29-4 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
returned to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
taken from Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|