Senate | 03/08/2024 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 80-15 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | introduced in House |