House
|
04/09/2024
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 117)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
to Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 80-9
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 09, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
to Small Business & Information Technology (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|