House | 03/25/2024 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | passed 20-16 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (5) and Floor Amendment (4-title) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | floor amendment (2-title) ruled out of order | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | floor amendments (1) and (3) withdrawn | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | floor amendment adopted Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (4-title) filed to bill | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | floor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | to Agriculture (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | introduced in Senate |