04/21/2010 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 49. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/15/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |||
04/14/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported with amendments (11-4) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/19/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/19/2010 | Prefiled. |