LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1306
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB1306
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB1306
Action History
06/08/2010
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
06/07/2010
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2010.
06/07/2010
Rules suspended, read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
06/07/2010
Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular).
04/20/2010
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
04/19/2010
Read by title.