|
06/17/2010
|
Read by title. Indefinitely postponed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/11/2010
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/3/2010.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read by title.
|
|
|