04/26/2010 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/22/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010. | |||
04/20/2010 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/19/2010 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/12/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |||
03/12/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
03/12/2010 | Prefiled. |