05/25/2010 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/20/2010 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |||
05/19/2010 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/18/2010 | Reported favorably (8-0) (Regular). | |||
03/29/2010 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
03/19/2010 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |||
03/15/2010 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. | |||
03/15/2010 | Prefiled. |