LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB53
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2010 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB53
Action History
04/13/2010
Becomes HB 1277.
04/12/2010
Reported by substitute (15-1) (Regular)
03/29/2010
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
02/26/2010
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2010.
02/26/2010
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
02/26/2010
Prefiled.