|
06/20/2010
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2010.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2010
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2010
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 5, 2010.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|